HI SB1014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1014
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the authority of the Director of Transportation over required motor vehicle and motor carrier vehicle inspections in the State. Upgrades the methods and procedures of state motor vehicle inspections. Clarifies the distinction between the inspection certificate expiration data and the vehicle's insurance expiration date. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Inspections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1148 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1148 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5