HI SB1015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 306D-4, HRS, to allow for the service of process issued by another state upon a Hawaii recipient and clarifies the following: (1) that the service of process may be upon a person or business, but not a government agency; (2) that the process is for the production of records; (3) that the process must be based upon a pending criminal investigation or prosecution; and (4) that the person or business being served must have conducted business or engaged in transactions occurring at least in part in the issuing state. Effective 07/01/50. (SD1)
Title
Records; Production; Out of State Service of Process
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Nakashima, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Takumi. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-13. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB785 (Same As) 2013-05-24 - Act 77, 5/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).