HI SB102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 216, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 216, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to report instances of suspected financial abuse of an elder directly to the appropriate county police department and the Department of Human Services. (CD1)
Title
Financial Abuse; Elder; Notification; Department of Human Services; County Police Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 216, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 216, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 81). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Jordan, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 4:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, McKelvey, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Espero, Baker, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 506). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-18-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 78) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).