HI SB103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of transportation to adopt rules that regulate and limit noise from vessels at harbors, ports, roadsteads, docks, wharves, piers, quays, bulkheads, and landings of the State.
Title
Relating To Vessels.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1254 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB103 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB103 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.