HI SB1037 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture to establish a mandatory disclosure program for pesticide use by all persons or entities under certain circumstances. Increases the pesticide use revolving fund balance ceiling to $500,000. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Pesticides; Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 267) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/AGL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai, Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/AGL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/AGL/ENE, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/AGL/ENE. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AGL/ENE, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |