HI SB1041 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a separate offense for those who provide anything of value to engage in sexual conduct with another; adds sex trafficking to offenses that can be prosecuted at any time; makes a person strictly liable for sex trafficking of a minor in terms of the victim's age; changes the name of the crime of solicitation of a minor for prostitution to commercial sexual exploitation of a minor while closing loopholes in the law that allow offenders to escape liability, and increases the grade of offense to a class B felony; adds "anything of value" to reflect the reality of non-monetary compensation used in commercial sexual exploitation.
Title
Relating To Crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1041&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1041_.HTM |