HI SB1057 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes employer contribution amounts for plan years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013 for EUTF health benefit plan premiums for the employees of collective bargaining units (9) and (10) and their excluded counterparts. Applies retroactively to 7/1/11 (CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Collective Bargaining Units (9) and (10); Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Employer Contributions
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Recommitted to Conference Committee. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Takumi, Johanson. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 590). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, Jordan, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor amendment failed following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 20. Noes, 31 (Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Cheape, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Ing, Johanson, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Ohno, Onishi, Rhoads, Saiki, Say, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Thielen, Woodson, Wooley, Yamane). Excused, 0 (none). |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment No. 23 offered by Rep. Oshiro. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 283) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB827 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5