HI SB1070 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Act 92, 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Act 92, 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of financial institutions to conduct examinations and investigations and adjust the fees for mortgage servicer licensees to use NMLS. (CD1)
Title
Mortgage Servicers; NMLS; Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Act 92, 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2013-06-03 | House | Act 092, on 5/31/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Thielen voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 21). |
2013-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Evans, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Evans, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Ito, Johanson, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 287) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB839 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN, WAM.