HI SB1071 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the contract hiring of at least 3 full-time security guards, police officers, or public safety officers with police powers at Mayor Wright Homes public housing complex. Requires a report to the legislature on the progress of security improvements at Mayor Wright Homes.
Title
Mayor Wright Homes; Security Appropriation; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1071&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1071_.HTM |