HI SB1075 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the cap on the amount of campaign funds candidates may donate to any community service, educational, youth, recreational, charitable, scientific, literary organization, public school, or public library.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1475 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1075 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to JDC.
SB1075 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1075&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1075_.HTM |