HI SB1096 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an exemption from applicable county permit requirements for repetitive construction projects for facilities under the control of the Department of Education, University of Hawaii, or School Facilities Authority.
Title
Relating To Permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU/HRE, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1096 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM/EDU/HRE, JDC.
HB562 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB562 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
County Permit Exemptions
Department of Education
Repetitive Construction
School Facilities Authority
University of Hawaii
Department of Education
Repetitive Construction
School Facilities Authority
University of Hawaii
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1096&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1096_.HTM |