HI SB1109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 328J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to prohibit the use of electronic smoking devices in the places where smoking is prohibited and updates signage requirements.
Title
Regulation of Tobacco Products
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:35PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB940 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1109&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1109_.HTM |