HI SB111 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Agriculture to create "made in Hawaii" labeling requirements for all agricultural commodities in Hawaii no later than July 1, 2015, through rules, which shall not supersede any state law regarding "made in Hawaii" labeling requirements for agricultural commodities enacted prior to the effective date of this Act. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD2)
Title
Agricultural Commodities; "Made in Hawaii" Labeling Requirements; Board of Agriculture; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 03-10-14 10:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from AGL/CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2600) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/CPN/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-14 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to AGL/CPN/WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to AGL. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to AGL. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-10-14 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |