HI SB1111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii State Fusion Center (Center) as a program under the Office of Homeland Security as described in chapter 128A, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Also establishes the position of Hawaii State Fusion Center Director who shall be state-funded, permanently exempt from chapter 76, Hawaii Revised Statutes, responsible to the Director of Homeland Security, and accountable to manage the operations of the Center.
Title
Relating To Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB957 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB957 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).