HI SB1119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that an offense is assault in the second degree if a person intentionally or knowingly causes bodily injury to a health care or human services professional. Defines health care or human services professional. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
HB1484 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
HB1484 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.