HI SB1128 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the 07/01/09 "sunset" date in Act 53, SLH 2008, that established the misdemeanor offense of theft of beer keg and imposed recordkeeping requirements on scrap metal dealers that purchase beer kegs. Effective 06/30/09.
Title
Metal; Beer Kegs; Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Saiki, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-09 2:15pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) One Day Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-26-09 9:00am in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |