HI SB1128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a capital improvement project for Leilehua high school.
Title
Relating To Improvements At Leilehua High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1128 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1128&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1128_.HTM |