HI SB1128 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits individual vocational programs within the purview of the office of youth services to engage in commercial enterprises, including the sale of goods and services, for self-sustainability purposes, for young adults only. Establishes the office of youth services revolving fund. Requires the office of youth services to submit annual reports to the legislature on the fiscal transactions and expenses of each service or program. Requires the director of human services to conduct an audit of the office of youth services if the annual fiscal transactions and expenses reports are not submitted in a timely manner. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Office Of Youth Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 3:40PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 905). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Acasio, Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 456). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 3:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1390) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 361) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB974 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1128 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB1128 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Annual Reports
Audit
Commercial Enterprise Vocational Programs
Director of Human Services
Office of Youth Services Revolving Fund
Audit
Commercial Enterprise Vocational Programs
Director of Human Services
Office of Youth Services Revolving Fund