HI SB1135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends and expands the Electronic Waste and Television Recycling Program. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB1135 HD1)
Title
Recycling; Electric Devices
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:14PM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Fale, Har, McDermott voting no (4) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla; 6 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan, Woodson. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ENE/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB904 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).