HI SB1135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new chapter on "source of income" discrimination in rental transactions, adds definitions, and enforcement remedies by direct civil action. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Rental Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB981 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1135 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB1135 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.