HI SB1144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish a homelessness coordinator position for the island of Maui within the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS/WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1254 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1144 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1144 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.