HI SB1150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1150
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to conduct a study on the effects of sunscreen on Hawaii's coral reefs and report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (SB1150 HD3)
Title
Relating To Preserving Coral Reefs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:45PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; L. Thielen Co-Chair; Gabbard. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Ing, Takumi, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EEP, OMH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 507). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Yamane, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1343) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, DeCoite, LoPresti, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takayama; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-03-15 | House | Re-referred to EEP, OMH, CPC, referral sheet 31 |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-16-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, OMH, CPC/FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, L. Thielen. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1150 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:45PM in conference room 309.