HI SB1157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the existence of the Starlight Reserve Advisory Committee until June 30, 2021. Amends the Office of Hawaiian Affairs' representative on the committee. Requires the Starlight Reserve Advisory Committee to report to the Legislature prior to the regular sessions of 2017 and 2019. (SB1157 HD1)
Title
Starlight Reserve; Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:46PM in Conference Room 423. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:35PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Johanson Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 590). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 321) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Harimoto. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |