HI SB1162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Promise Program to provide scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students enrolled at any campus of the University of Hawaii system or any community college campus. Appropriates funds to establish and implement the program. (SB1162 HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 352) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-15-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1594 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
SB1162 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB1162 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).