HI SB1186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the penalties imposed for failure to comply with Act 326, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012 and imposes civil penalties instead of criminal penalties.
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee on THA deferred the measure. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB955 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1186&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB1186_.htm |