HI SB1189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals particular funds that have become dormant or unnecessary and transfers the unencumbered balances in those funds into the high technology special fund. (SD1)
Title
Special Funds; Revolving Funds; Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; High Technology Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1244 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6