HI SB1189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical and housekeeping amendments to Act 150, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018. Authorizes the expenditure of funds from the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund for the acquisition of the ground lease on the Front Street Apartments property. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB962 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB962 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6