HI SB1192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Kapolei jobs initiative pilot program that offers incentives to increase the number of businesses willing to establish themselves or open a new location in the Kapolei region. Establishes a tax credit, until 12/31/2024, as part of the Kapolei jobs initiative pilot program.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1192 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB943 (Same As) 2017-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
HB943 (Same As) 2017-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1192&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1192_.HTM |