HI SB1199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates and clarifies unlawful disclosure of tax returns and tax return information requirements under chapter 231, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Unlawful Disclosure of Tax Returns and Tax Return Information
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB968 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1199&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB1199_.htm |