HI SB1231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes either the State Health Planning and Development Agency or the Department of Health to deploy statewide health planning and resource development programs and resources. Provides that any money in the state health planning and development special fund in excess of $2,000,000 shall lapse to the general fund. Effective 7/1/2050. Department of Health's duty to deploy programs and resources repeals 6/30/2026. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Statewide Health Planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 388) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1231 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
State Health Planning and Development Agency
Statewide Health Planning and Resource Development Program Reform
Statewide Health Planning and Resource Development Program Reform