HI SB1234 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the office of collective bargaining, including the position of chief negotiator, to the department of human resources development. Eliminates references to managed competition in chapter 89A, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Collective Bargaining And Managed Competition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1008 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1234 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1234 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.