HI SB1242 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the prohibition on the sale of Kakaako community development district lands by HCDA to Kakaako makai lands. Requires the HCDA to determine the costs and benefits of selling and purchasing certain properties, except makai lands, within the Kakaako community development district and report to the legislature by October 1, 2013.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako Community Development District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1242&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1242_.HTM |