HI SB1242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1242
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends DOH's solid waste management goals by repealing outdated goals, reducing solid waste stream prior to disposal by seventy per cent by January 1, 2030, and establishing a goal of source reduction of fifty per cent by 2030. (SB1242 HD1)
Title
Relating To Solid Waste Disposal Goals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Har, Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 533). |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1932), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1459) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1242 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
HB1016 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to AEN, CPH.
HB1016 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to AEN, CPH.