HI SB1245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue administration of the Hawaii home visiting program, a hospital-based early identification designed to enhance health and safety outcomes and prevent child abuse and neglect, and ensure continuation of home visiting services in certain priority high-risk neighborhoods.
Title
Hawaii Home Visiting Program; Infants; Healthcare; Families; Children; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1245&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1245_.HTM |