HI SB1255 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to demolish the Ewa Beach fire station and construct a LEED certified EMS facility at the same location.
Title
Emergency Medical Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB363 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1255&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1255_.HTM |