HI SB1264 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the rates for employer contributions to the Employees' Retirement System.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Employer Contribution Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Same As) 2011-02-26 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1264 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1264_.htm |