HI SB1281 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for operating expenses of the Kahilu theatre in Waimea, Hawaii, in the form of a grant from the state foundation on culture and the arts. (SD1)
Title
Kahilu Theatre; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:16PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |