HI SB1281 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1281
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows transient accommodations brokers to register as a tax collection agent on behalf of all of its operators and plan managers. Requires registered transient accommodations broker tax collection agent's operators and plan managers to obtain licensure. Requires all registered transient accommodations broker tax collection agents to inquire and ensure that the transient accommodation is in compliance with all pertinent state and county land use laws. Requires the operator or plan manager to provide verification of compliance with county land use laws in the form of a written certification, verification, or permit issued by the appropriate county agency.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/CPH deferred the measure until 02-10-17 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to ETT/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1281 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
General Excise Tax
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Brokers
Transient Accommodations Tax
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Brokers
Transient Accommodations Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1281&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1281_.HTM |