HI SB1282 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a special innovative procurement process for the procurement of supplies, services, professional services, or construction. Requires the establishment of procedures by the procurement policy board for use of the special innovative procurement process.
Title
Procurement Code; Special Innovative Procurement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1028 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1282&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1282_.HTM |