HI SB1290 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a full-service restaurant from providing a single-use plastic straw to a consumer unless requested by the consumer. Takes effect 1/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Single-use Plastic Straws.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1290 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB762 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB762 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1290&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1290_.HTM |