HI SB1302 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that reasonable accommodation in housing for persons with a disability includes accommodation of a service animal in accordance with federal law. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Fair Housing; Reasonable Accommodations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1075 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.