HI SB1304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit of twenty-five per cent of the total cost, including installation, of an automatic fire sprinkler or automatic fire sprinkler system in any new detached one- or two-family dwelling unit in a structure used only for residential purposes. Sunsets on June 30, 2025.
Title
Fire Sprinklers; Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HSH, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1242 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1304&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1304_.HTM |