HI SB1311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 107, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 107, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a licensed or credentialed practitioner practicing within the practitioner's own recognized scope of practice from licensure and certification requirements. Temporarily exempts from the licensing requirements for the practice of behavior analysis, direct support workers who provide autism treatment services pursuant to an Individualized Education Plan. Requires the Department of Education to report to the Legislature on implementing measures to comply with the licensure and certification requirements. (CD1)
Title
Licensed Behavior Analyst; Practitioner; Direct Support Worker; Psychologist; Healthcare Professional
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 107, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 107, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Kawakami, Keohokalole, Pouha, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75-16). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, McKelvey, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, English Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Belatti, McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to EDN, HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 476). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, Keohokalole, Morikawa, Pouha, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Lowen, Tokioka, Pouha; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama, Johanson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Re-referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2788) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HTH, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1440 (Same As)