HI SB1335 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes hemp to the extent legalized under federal law. Requires the Chairperson of the Board of Agriculture to prepare and submit a proposed state plan to monitor and regulate hemp production, including commercial production and research, to the federal Secretary of Agriculture pursuant to section 297B of the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946, as amended. Requires reports to the Governor and Legislature.
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-08-19 2:01PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB131 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1335 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
SB1335 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1335&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1335_.HTM |