HI SB1335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 2 of Act 97, Session Laws of Hawaii 2022, to reflect the migration of the Office of Homeland Security from the Department of Defense to the Department of Law Enforcement on January 1, 2024.
Title
Relating To Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Department of Law Enforcement
Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications Executive Committee
Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications Executive Committee
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1335&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1335_.HTM |