HI SB1341 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various revisions to the employees' retirement system. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB1341 HD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 8:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 662). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1549), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-04-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-11 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 729) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |