HI SB1348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain groceries, feminine hygiene products, incontinence products, and over-the-counter drugs from the general excise tax.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1050 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1348 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
SB1348 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1348&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1348_.HTM |