HI SB137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Innovation and Commercialization Initiative Program to expressly give the University of Hawaii the legal authority to create, finance, and participate in new economic enterprises and expand workforce opportunities based on inventions and discoveries generated by or at the University. Creates Special Fund. (SB137 HD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Research.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5). |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HED, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/ETT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-17 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HRE/ETT, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB847 (Same As)
SB137 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB137 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).