HI SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fine that may be assessed, for campaign spending law violations, against a noncandidate committee making only independent expenditures and that has received at least 1 contribution of more than $10,000, or spent more than $10,000 in an election period. Allows the Campaign Spending Commission to order that payment of a fine assessed against a noncandidate committee, or any portion thereof, be paid from the personal funds of an officer of the noncandidate committee.
Title
Relating To Violations Of Campaign Finance Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB137 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB162 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB162 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=137&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB137_.HTM |