HI SB137 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that restrooms and toilet facilities of public amusement facilities constructed, renovated, retrofitted, or installed after 1/1/2024 have two female-use toilets for each male-use toilet or urinal. Requires certain state building construction that is constructed or substantially modified after 1/1/2024 to provide for the installation of a gender-neutral bathroom with at least three stalls.
Title
Relating To Gender Equity.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB137 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=137&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB137_.HTM |